Balofsky, Ari Shmuel (CPSO#: 110855)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Sep 2016

Expiry Date:  31 Dec 2018

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Clinical Fellow as of 01 Sep 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Tel Aviv University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathrust Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4800
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

No Privileges reported.

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  August 3, 2018
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On August 3, 2018, University Health Network notified the College, pursuant to s.85.5(1) of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Regulated Health Professions Act, and s. 33(d) of the Public Hospitals Act, that effective August 3, 2018, Dr. Ari Balofsky was suspended from his hospital appointments at University Health Network and Women’s College Hospital.

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARI SHMUEL BALOFSKY may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. BALOFSKY is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. BALOFSKY shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. BALOFSKY is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. BALOFSKY shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. BALOFSKY ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. BALOFSKY ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When three years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 31 Dec 2018.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Dec 2017
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Dec 2018
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2018

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: August 3, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Criminal Charges:
Effective May 29, 2015, where a member has been charged with an offence under the Criminal Code of Canada or the Ontario Health Insurance Act and the charge is outstanding and is known to the College, the College By-laws require certain information about the charge to be posted on the register.

The follow are outstanding charges against this member, as known to the College:
1. Unlawfully possess a substance (marihuana) on or about August 1, 2018 at the City of Toronto, contrary to section 4(1) of the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act.
2. Unlawfully produce a substance (marihuana) on or about August 1, 2018 at the City of Toronto, contrary to section 7(1) of the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act.
3. Unlawfully possess a substance (marihuana) for the purpose of trafficking on or about August 1, 2018 at the City of Toronto, contrary to section 5(2) of the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act.

Date of Charge: August 3, 2018
Place of Charges: Toronto, Ontario
Toronto Police Service


Source: Member
Active Date: August 2, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective December 4, 2014, the College By-laws require members to report to the College any currently existing conditions of release (“bail conditions”) following a charge for a criminal or provincial offence or subsequent to a finding of guilt and pending appeal. The following are conditions of release made against this member:

[August 2, 2018]

1. Notify specified officer within 24 hours of any change in his address, employment or occupation.