Balogh, Arpad (CPSO#: 25690)

Current Status: Expired: Member deceased as of 23 Mar 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 23 Mar 2018

Summary

Date of Death: 23-Mar-2018

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hungarian

Education:University of Toronto, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Requests for Medical Records should be directed to the attention of Dr. J.J. Bishop at: 240 McNabb St Sault Ste Marie, ON P6B 1Y5
Date Received: 14 Jun 2018

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1973
Expired: Member deceased. Expiry date: 23 Mar 2018