Bamaga, Ahmed Khamis A (CPSO#: 94919)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Mar 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Mar 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AHMED KHAMIS A BAMAGA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAMAGA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 04 Apr 2011 to 22 Jun 2011
PEAP - Resident - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 23 Jun 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 20 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 21 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 20 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 21 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 20 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 21 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2018