Bambury, Ian Garfield (CPSO#: 91834)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 23 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 23 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of the West Indies, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 09 Jul 2009 to 05 Aug 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Oncology

University of Ottawa, 06 Aug 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Jun 2011