Banach, Ryan Leonard (CPSO#: 89071)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 301
2100 Finch Avenue West
North York ON  M3N 2Z9
Phone: (416) 739-8700
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ryan Banach Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 12 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Banach ( CPSO# 89071 )

Business Address:
Suite 301
2100 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M3N 2Z9
Phone Number: (416) 739-8700

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RYAN LEONARD BANACH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BANACH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2010