Banack, Alan David (CPSO#: 21990)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alan D. Banack Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 19 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Banack ( CPSO# 21990 )

Business Address:
8 King Street East
Suite 105
Toronto ON  M5C 1C3
Phone Number: (416) 920-9139

Medical Records Location

Address: DOCUdavit Solutions Inc. 28 Eugene St, North York, ON M6B 3Z4 Tel: 1 888-781-9083 Fax: 1-866-297-9338
Date Received: 04 May 2018

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018