Banamah, Turki Abdulrahman Salem (CPSO#: 90041)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Dec 2008 to 09 Jan 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 10 Jan 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012