Banasch, Matthew Jacob (CPSO#: 95403)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Matthew Banasch Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 04 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Choo ( CPSO# 95569 )
Dr. M. Banasch ( CPSO# 95403 )

Business Address:
399 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5

Business Address:
London Health Centre
Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MATTHEW JACOB BANASCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BANASCH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016