Bandsma, Robertus Hermanus Johannes (CPSO#: 89609)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Dec 2013

Expiry Date:  17 Dec 2020

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 18 Dec 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Dutch, English

Education:State University of Groningen, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children,
Division of Gastroenterology,
Department of Paediatrics
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-1500 Ext. 309057
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: van den Heuvel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 04 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. van den Heuvel ( CPSO# 92573 )
Dr. R. Bandsma ( CPSO# 89609 )

Business Address:
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Gastroenterology
Department of Paediatrics
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-1500

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8

Business Address:
89 Humber College Boulevard
Suite 303
Toronto ON  M9V 4B8

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Netherlands

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 18 Dec 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 17 Sep 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 18 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Sep 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration Expiry Date: 17 Dec 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 20 Sep 2016 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Robertus Hermanus Johannes Bandsma may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Paediatrics,   Division   of   Gastroenterology,   Hepatology   and
                        Nutrition,  University  of  Toronto,  in which Dr. Bandsma holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires  seven  years from
                  the  date  of  issuance or when Dr. Bandsma  no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate  of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the  Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the  College  receives  a  report  indicating  that  Dr.  Bandsma's
                        clinical  performance,  knowledge,  skill,  judgment,  professional
                        conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee  does  not  receive  an  annual  report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Bandsma's certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This  certificate  is  issued  on  December 18, 2013. In accordance  with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate  will,  if not extended by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on December 17, 2020.