Bandukwala, Taha Shabbir (CPSO#: 95124)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1200 Fourth Ave
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone: 9053784647 Ext. 29130
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T.S. Bandukwala Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 23 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Bandukwala ( CPSO# 95124 )

Business Address:
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6X2
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
65 Third Street
Welland ON  L3B 4W6
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TAHA SHABBIR BANDUKWALA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BANDUKWALA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016