Banerjee, Lopita (CPSO#: 75085)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English

Education:University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Wise Elephant Family Health Team
4A - 2 Kennedy Road South
Brampton ON  L6W 3E1
Phone: (905) 459-4385
Fax: (905) 459-6373
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Canada
Phone: 905-494-2120 Ext. 56516
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Peel Public Health Clinic
150 Central Park Drive
Brampton ON  L6T 2T9
Canada
Phone: 905-791-5905
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

William Osler Health System
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Street East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Canada
Phone: 905-494-2120 Ext. 56516
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Banerjee Goel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 21 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Goel ( CPSO# 71460 )
Dr. L. Banerjee ( CPSO# 75085 )

Business Address:
William Osler Health Centre
Peel Memorial Hospital
20 Lynch Street
Brampton ON  L6W 2Z8
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Business Address:
Wise Elephant Family Health
4A- 2 Kennedy Road South
Brampton ON  L6V 1P6
Phone Number: (905) 459-4385

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LOPITA BANERJEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BANERJEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 2002