Banerjee, Probuddha Joy (CPSO#: 71640)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Aug 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone: (519) 822-5350 Ext. x2437
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

235 Union Street East
Fergus ON  N1M 1W3
Canada
Phone: (519) 843-2010
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

630 Dublin Street
louise marshall hospital
Mount Forest ON  N0G 2L3
Canada
Phone: (519) 323-2210
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

Palmerston and district hospital
500 Whites Road
Palmerston ON  N0G 2P0
Canada
Phone: (519) 343-2030
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P. J. Banerjee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 13 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Banerjee ( CPSO# 71640 )

Business Address:
Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone Number: (519) 822-5350

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Groves Memorial Community Hospital,Fergus Fergus
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Louise Marshall Hospital,North Wellington Health Care Mount Forest
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
Palmerston & District Site,North Wellington Health Care Corp Palmerston
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 31 May 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PROBUDDHA JOY BANERJEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BANERJEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 01 Mar 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 02 Mar 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Aug 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Aug 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jun 2005 to 31 May 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jun 2006 to 31 May 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jun 2007 to 31 May 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jun 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1999