Banga, Kamaljeet Singh (CPSO#: 90681)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dayanand Medical College, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
17 lancing street
Auburn NY  13021
United States
Phone: 315-406-0983

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAMALJEET SINGH BANGA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BANGA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Oct 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Oct 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2015