Banglawala, Sarfaraz Mubarak (CPSO#: 89072)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 617
2250 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 0W3
Phone: (905) 792-6949
Fax: (905) 792-6977
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S M Banglawala Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 12 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Banglawala ( CPSO# 89072 )

Business Address:
617 - 2250 Bovaird Drive
Brampton ON  L6R 0W3
Phone Number: (905) 792-6949

Business Address:
7335 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  L3T 2B2
Phone Number: (905) 707-7309

Business Address:
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-2200

Business Address:
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARFARAZ MUBARAK BANGLAWALA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BANGLAWALA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2014