Banhara, Milton Filho (CPSO#: 91916)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Feb 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Feb 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese, Spanish

Education:Federal Univ of Santa Catarina, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oakville Trafalgar
Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone: (905) 845-2571
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A4
Canada
Phone: 519-421-4211
County: County of Oxford
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Milton Filho Banhara Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 21 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Banhara ( CPSO# 91916 )

Business Address:
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Dec 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MILTON FILHO BANHARA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BANHARA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 23 Jul 2009 to 14 Oct 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 15 Oct 2009 to 22 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 23 Jul 2010 to 22 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 23 Jul 2011 to 31 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 May 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Feb 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 2013