Bani-Ata, Majid Khaleel Mohammed (CPSO#: 92417)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Jordan University of Sci. & Technology, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2010 to 11 Mar 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 12 Mar 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011