Bansal, Ashima (CPSO#: 94544)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Dec 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Dec 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St. Matthew's University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1813 LaSalle Boulevard
Sudbury ON  P3A 2A3
Phone: (705) 222-2234
Fax: (705) 222-9041
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

144 pine street
Sudbury ON  P3C 1X3
Canada
Phone: (705) 669-1520
Fax: (705) 674-7483
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Canada
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ashima Bansal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 14 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bansal ( CPSO# 94544 )

Business Address:
B - 1813 LaSalle Boulevard
Sudbury ON  P3A 2A3
Phone Number: (705) 222-2933

Business Address:
3570 Raft Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3G 1M4

Business Address:
41 Ramsey Lake
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1

Business Address:
1405 Bancroft Drive
Sudbury ON  P3B 1R6

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Dec 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ASHIMA BANSAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BANSAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 25 Oct 2010 to 16 Jan 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 17 Jan 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 23 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 24 Sep 2012 to 21 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Oct 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2012