Bansal, Atul (CPSO#: 80374)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jun 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:American University of the Caribbean, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone: (905) 472-7000
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Atul Bansal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 04 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bansal ( CPSO# 80374 )

Business Address:
381 Church Street
PO Box 1800
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 May 2005 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 19 Sep 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ATUL BANSAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BANSAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2004 to 30 Jan 2004
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 31 Jan 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Jan 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Dec 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Mar 2007
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Feb 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2005