Baqer, Ayyoub Baqer Ali Abbas (CPSO#: 76978)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Kuwait University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 14 May 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 14 Aug 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 15 Aug 2002 to 14 Aug 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 15 Aug 2003 to 14 Aug 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 15 Aug 2004 to 14 Aug 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 15 Aug 2005 to 14 Aug 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 15 Aug 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008