Bar, Jair (CPSO#: 89728)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The Hebrew University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Bar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 9 2012

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 05 Aug 2008 to 15 Sep 2008
PEAP - Resident - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 16 Sep 2008 to 04 Feb 2009
Elective Trainee - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 08 Jul 2009 to 04 Aug 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 05 Aug 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Feb 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 04 Aug 2012