Baral, Stefan David (CPSO#: 86021)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Mar 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Mar 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Swedish

Education:Queen's University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Inner City Health Associates
59 Adelaide St. East
Toronto ON  M5C 1K6
Phone: 416-591-4414
Fax: 416-640-2072
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Dec 2009 CFPC Specialist
Community Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEFAN DAVID BARAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Jul 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 2016