Barankin, Benjamin (CPSO#: 78418)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Dermatology Centre
Suite 400
4256 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M3H 5Y8
Phone: (416) 633-0001
Fax: (416) 633-0002
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Benjamin Barankin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 21 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Barankin ( CPSO# 78418 )

Business Address:
Toronto Dermatology Centre
Suite 400
4256 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M3H 5Y8
Phone Number: (416) 633-0001


Corporation Name: Barankin & Freiman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 16 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Barankin ( CPSO# 78418 )
Dr. A. Freiman ( CPSO# 82004 )

Business Address:
Toronto Dermatology Centre
Suite 400
4256 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M3H 5Y8
Phone Number: (416) 633-0001

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BENJAMIN BARANKIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARANKIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 29 Jul 2002 to 25 Aug 2002
Elective Trainee - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 07 Nov 2004 to 19 Nov 2004
Elective Trainee - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 04 Sep 2005 to 18 Sep 2005
Elective Trainee - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Aug 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Nov 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Nov 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Sep 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006