Baratz, Ari Yosef-Shalom (CPSO#: 76552)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Create Fertility Centre
Suite 1100
790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone: (416) 323-7727
Fax: (416) 323-7334
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ari Y. Baratz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 26 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Goldberg ( CPSO# 80727 )
Dr. A. Baratz ( CPSO# 76552 )

Business Address:
Create Fertility Centre
1100 - 790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone Number: (413) 323-7727

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARI YOSEF-SHALOM BARATZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARATZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006