Barbeau, Brynlea Jae (CPSO#: 77576)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 May 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 May 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 11
773 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0B7
Phone: (705) 946-7362
Fax: (705) 450-6337
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Canada
Phone: (705) 759-3434
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brynlea Barbeau Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 12 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Barbeau ( CPSO# 77576 )

Business Address:
11 - 773 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0B7
Phone Number: (705) 946-7362

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 May 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRYNLEA JAE BARBEAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARBEAU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 01 May 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 May 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 May 2005