Barber, Darren Charles Arthur (CPSO#: 84010)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin Trinity College, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Peterborough Medical Clinic
26 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C3
Phone: (705) 740-6856
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Darren C. A. Barber Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 15 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Barber ( CPSO# 84010 )

Business Address:
Peterborough Medical Clinic
26 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C3
Phone Number: (705) 740-6856

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Dec 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DARREN CHARLES ARTHUR BARBER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARBER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 26 Jan 2006 to 08 Feb 2006
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Feb 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2010