Barbero, Joseph (CPSO#: 88770)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Sep 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Sep 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
123 Marks Street
Atikokan ON  P0T 1C0
Phone: (807) 597-2721
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joseph Barbero Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 18 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Barbero ( CPSO# 88770 )

Business Address:
123 Marks Street
Atikokan ON  P0T 1C0
Phone Number: (807) 597-2721

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Atikokan General Hospital Atikokan

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSEPH BARBERO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARBERO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 11 Apr 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2010