Barbosa, Rubens Fernando Henriques Cespe (CPSO#: 83909)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 May 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 May 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Portuguese

Education:Pontificia Univ Catolica De Campinas, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
75 Leonard drive
Sussex NB  E4E 2P7
Phone: 506 432 3100

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Shouldice Hospital Ltd. Markham

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RUBENS FERNANDO HENRIQUES CESPE BARBOSA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARBOSA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2006 to 24 Mar 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 25 Mar 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Mar 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 May 2013

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: July 12, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)