Barbour, Sean Jacob (CPSO#: 90432)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 27 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2009 to 26 Jun 2009
Elective Trainee - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 2012