Barboza, Milan Kumar (CPSO#: 91921)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Konkani, Portuguese, Spanish

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-2200
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Milan Barboza Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 14 2017


Corporation Name: Milan Barboza Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 06 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Barboza ( CPSO# 91921 )

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Elignton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-2200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MILAN KUMAR BARBOZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARBOZA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 27 Jul 2009 to 23 Aug 2009
Elective Trainee - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011