Bardai, Sadrudin Jamal Karim (CPSO#: 28543)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Swahili

Education:University of Manchester, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: RSRS - Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St Regis Crescent S, North York, ON M3J 1Y6 Tel: 1-866-245-7607 ext 2. Email: info@rsrs.com
Date Received: 07 Jun 2018


Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St. Regis Crescent South Toronto ON M3J 1Y6 Website: www.rsrs.com Tel: (416) 398-0638 Fax: (416) 398-5932 Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732
Date Received: 26 Jan 2015

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2014
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Jun 2018