Bardai, Zahra (CPSO#: 71306)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brock CHC
64 Cameron St. East
Cannington ON  L0E 1E0
Phone: 705-432-3388
Fax: 705-432-3389
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

4646 Dufferin Street, Unit 5, Box 5
Toronto ON  M3H 5S4
Canada
Phone: (647) 794-6950
Fax: (647)-794-6962
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Zahra Bardai Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 26 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Bardai ( CPSO# 71306 )

Business Address:
Brock CHC
64 Cameron Street East
P O Box 69
Cannington ON  L0E 1E0
Phone Number: (705) 432-3388

Business Address:
Involved Medicine
5-4646 Dufferin Street
Toronto ON  M3H 5S4
Phone Number: (647) 794-6950

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ZAHRA BARDAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARDAI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1999