Barefah, Ahmed Salleh A (CPSO#: 94980)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 09 Jul 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Jul 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 04 Nov 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 20 May 2011 to 28 Jun 2011
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 29 Jun 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History