Baribeau, Jean-Guy Yves (CPSO#: 33702)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Aug 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 04 May 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: Baribeau, Joseph Jean-Guy Yves (used until: 14 Sep 1982 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:University of Ottawa, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Floor #6 - Workstation B076
140 Promenade du Portage-Phase 4
Gatineau-QC - K1A 0J9
Gatineau QC  K1A 0J9
Phone: (819) 654-2783

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 1982
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 May 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 04 May 2018

Pending Hearings

Summary: Baribeau, Jean-Guy Yves (April 4, 2018) Allegations of Dr. Baribeau’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Discipline Committee. It is alleged that Dr. Baribeau engaged in the sexual abuse of Patient A and/or in disgraceful, dishonorable or unprofessional conduct by engaging in sexual and/or inappropriate contact with Patient A, including sexual and/or inappropriate touching of Patient A’s genitals and rectum and by making inappropriate comments with respect to Patient A’s physique. It is also alleged that Dr. Baribeau is incompetent and/or failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in his care of Patient A.

Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Hearing Date(s): March 4 to 8, 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 04 May 2018 Active View Details [+]

            As from May 4, 2018, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Jean-Guy Yves
            Baribeau in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Baribeau to
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                            ("Undertaking")
                                                  of
                                      DR. JEAN-GUY YVES BARIBEAU
                                           ("Dr. Baribeau")
                                                  to
                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")


            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Resolution Committee
                  of the College;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public. 
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Baribeau, certificate of registration number 33702, am a member of
                  the College.

            (3)   I, Dr. Baribeau, acknowledge that the College has referred to the
                  Discipline Committee, in the matter of College File Number 102418,
                  allegations that I engaged in professional misconduct and/or am
                  incompetent.

            (4)   I, Dr. Baribeau, have read the Notice of Hearing dated April 4, 2018,
                  which sets out the allegations against me.  I am aware of the College's
                  concern about protecting the public and I understand the nature of the
                  allegations against me.

            (5)   I, Dr. Baribeau, acknowledge that the ICR Committee has accepted this
                  Undertaking in lieu of making an Order under section 25.4 of the Code at
                  this time.

            (6)   I, Dr. Baribeau, acknowledge that this Undertaking does not preclude the
                  ICR Committee from making an order at a later date in accordance with the
                  Code.

            (7)   I, Dr. Baribeau, acknowledge that this Undertaking continues in force
                  until the matters currently referred are disposed of by a panel of the
                  Discipline Committee.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (8)   I, Dr. Baribeau, undertake to abide by the provisions of this
                  Undertaking, effective immediately ("Effective Date").

            (9)   Practice Restrictions

                  (a)   I, Dr. Baribeau, undertake to restrict my practice as follows:
                  
                        (i)   Effective immediately, I will not engage in any in-person
                              patient encounters and
                  
                        (ii)  Commencing on July 1, 2019 , I will restrict my practice to
                              work with the Canadian Pension Plan, which  will not involve
                              any patient encounters, in-person or otherwise.
                  
                  Rockwood Residence and House Call Patients 
                  
                  (b)   Until July 1, 2019 I, Dr. Baribeau, will monitor and follow up with
                        any test results I have ordered for my former patients at Rockwood
                        Residence and for any of my  house call patients.
                  
                  (c)   Until July 1, 2019 I, Dr. Baribeau, will make efforts to provide
                        any relevant referrals to my former patients at Rockwood Residence
                        and to my former house call patients.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Baribeau, will ensure that any follow up or referrals
                        required will be communicated by telephone or through written
                        correspondence.
                  
            (10)  Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Baribeau, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location where I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within five
                        (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further
                        undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Baribeau, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient
                        charts by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring
                        my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Baribeau, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP, and/or any person or institution
                        that may have relevant information, in order for the College to
                        monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Baribeau, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent
                        form, attached hereto as Appendix "A".
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (11)  I, Dr. Baribeau, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
                  to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (12)  I, Dr. Baribeau, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (13)  I, Dr. Baribeau, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (14)  I, Dr. Baribeau, acknowledge that the College will provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (15)  I, Dr. Baribeau, acknowledge that, in the event of an appeal of any order
                  of the Discipline Committee, if the Discipline Committee has directed the
                  Registrar to revoke, suspend, or impose terms and conditions on my
                  certificate of registration, that order will take effect immediately
                  despite any appeal.

            (16)  I, Dr. Baribeau, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee.

            (17)  I, Dr. Baribeau, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (18)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Baribeau, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking 
                        remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public
                        Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Baribeau, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (18)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                        Dr. Baribeau is the subject of a referral to the Discipline
                        Committee into allegations of professional misconduct and/or
                        incompetence. 
                  
                        As a result of the referral, Dr. Baribeau has restricted his
                        practice as follows:
                  
                              Effective immediately, Dr. Baribeau will not perform any
                              in-person patient encounters; and 
                  
                              Commencing July 1, 2019, Dr. Baribeau restrict his practice
                              to work with the Canada Pension Plan. This work will not
                              involve any patient encounters, in-person or otherwise.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (19)  I, Dr. Baribeau, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  all Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to
                  the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any
                  information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this
                  Undertaking.

            (20)  I, Dr. Baribeau, give my irrevocable consent to all Chiefs of Staff to
                  disclose to the College, and to one another, any information relevant to
                  this Undertaking and/or relevant for the purposes of monitoring my
                  compliance with this undertaking.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: May 4, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Stephanie Jo Brister to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective May 8, 2018:

Dr. Baribeau is the subject of a referral to the Discipline Committee into allegations of professional misconduct and/or incompetence.

As a result of the referral, Dr. Baribeau has restricted his practice as follows:

Effective immediately, Dr. Baribeau will not perform any in-person patient encounters; and

Commencing July 1, 2019, Dr. Baribeau restrict his practice to work with the Canada Pension Plan. This work will not involve any patient encounters, in-person or otherwise.