Baril-Guerard, Elyse Marie Christine (CPSO#: 89653)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 28 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jul 2010 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 28 Jul 2008 to 28 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 29 Jul 2009 to 28 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Jul 2010