Barker, Eric James (CPSO#: 25699)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Eric Barker, Medicine, Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 03 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Barker ( CPSO# 25699 )

Business Address:
Grey Bruce Health Services
Allied Health Building
369 Mary Street
Wiarton ON  N0H 2T0
Phone Number: (519) 373-1684

Medical Records Location

Address: c/o Dr. Eric Barker PO Box 591 Wiarton, ON N0H 2T0
Date Received: 22 May 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1974 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018