Barker, Sarah Jane (CPSO#: 74943)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Apr 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
17 Dunedin Street
Orillia ON  L3V 5T3
Phone: (705) 327-9188
Fax: (705) 327-9189
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne Street
Orillia ON  L3V 2Z3
Canada
Phone: (705) 325-2201
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Collingwood General
and Marine Hospital
459 Hume Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1W9
Canada
Phone: (705) 445-2550
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sarah Barker Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 20 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Barker ( CPSO# 74943 )

Business Address:
17 Dunedin Street
Orillia ON  L3V 5T3
Phone Number: (705) 327-9188

Business Address:
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia ON  L3V 2Z3
Phone Number: (705) 325-2201

Business Address:
459 Humes Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1W8
Phone Number: (705) 444-2550

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 18 Nov 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARAH JANE BARKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARKER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 24 Nov 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 25 Nov 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 09 Jan 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 10 Jan 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 2005