Barkey, Janice Lynn (CPSO#: 77430)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Mar 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Mar 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Div of Paediatric Gastroenterology
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ont
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 1516
Fax: (613) 738-4854
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 05 Oct 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANICE LYNN BARKEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARKEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 06 May 2002 to 14 Jun 2002
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 May 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Mar 2006