Barkman, Frederick (CPSO#: 83410)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Feb 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Feb 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
100 Marie Curie
Ottawa ON  K1N 6N5
Phone: (613) 564-3950
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Frederick Barkman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 29 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Jan 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FREDERICK BARKMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARKMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 2009