Barlow, Malcolm Andrew (CPSO#: 72909)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 14 Aug 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Aug 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Melbourne, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 14 Aug 1999
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Aug 1999