Barnes, Stephanie Victoria (CPSO#: 100938)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Aug 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Aug 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 25 Aug 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHANIE VICTORIA BARNES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARNES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 25 Aug 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Aug 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2018