Barnicke, Daiva Aldona (CPSO#: 93197)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: Lenauskas, Daiva Aldona (used until: 22 Nov 2015 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St. Matthew's University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medcan
Suite 1500
150 York Street
Toronto ON  M5H 3S5
Phone: (416) 350-5900
Fax: (416) 350-5981
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Daiva Barnicke Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 03 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Barnicke ( CPSO# 93197 )

Business Address:
MedCan Clinic
Suite 1500
150 York Street
Toronto ON  M5H 3S5
Phone Number: (416) 350-5900

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAIVA ALDONA BARNICKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARNICKE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2012