Barrese, Nancy (CPSO#: 73612)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oshawa Clinic
117 King Street East
Oshawa ON  L1H 1B9
Phone: (905) 721-3546
Fax: (905) 721-4342
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Lakeridge Health Corporation
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Canada
Phone: (905) 576-8711 Ext. 3200
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N. Barrese Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 07 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Barrese ( CPSO# 73612 )

Business Address:
Oshawa Clinic
4th Floor
117 King Street East
Oshawa ON  L1H 1B9
Phone Number: (905) 721-3546

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Lakeridge Health,Whitby Site Whitby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 May 2003 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 15 Sep 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NANCY BARRESE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARRESE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Sep 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 20 Aug 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2003