Barrett, Kali Alyssa (CPSO#: 90482)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Mar 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital, UHN
2-McLaughlin 411-J
399 Bathurst St
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: 416-603-5800
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

101 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Canada
Phone: 416-747-3400
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

The Scarborough Hospital
Critical Care Department
3050 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Canada
Phone: 416 438 2911
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kali Alyssa Barrett Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 22 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Barrett ( CPSO# 90482 )

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital - UHN
2-McLaughlin 411-J
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KALI ALYSSA BARRETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARRETT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Mar 2014