Barrett, Keith Paul (CPSO#: 91216)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Urology Associates
Unit 18
450 Westheights Drive
Kitchener ON  N2N 0B5
Phone: (519) 578-1282
Fax: (519) 578-1362
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K Barrett Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 22 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Barrett ( CPSO# 91216 )

Business Address:
Urology Associates
18-450 Westheights Drive
Kitchener ON  N2N 0B5
Phone Number: (519) 578-1282

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEITH PAUL BARRETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARRETT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014