Barrett, Lisa (CPSO#: 92082)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 14 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 Aug 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 10 Aug 2009 to 09 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 10 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 09 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2010
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 14 Aug 2014