Barron, Jacquelyn Alexandra (CPSO#: 84627)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto East General Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
5th Floor
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 469-6580
Fax: (416) 469-6805
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 31 May 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JACQUELYN ALEXANDRA BARRON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARRON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 May 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2014