Barros, Bernardo Silveira (CPSO#: 90283)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 18 May 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 18 May 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Universidade Do Estado Do Rio De Janeiro, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2009 to 18 May 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 19 May 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 18 May 2012
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Mar 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 May 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 May 2012