Barry, Catherine Anne (CPSO#: 93252)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 107
444 Douro Street
Stratford ON  N5A 0E6
Phone: (519) 273-0100
Fax: (519) 273-0675
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Catherine Barry Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 07 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Barry ( CPSO# 93252 )

Business Address:
107 - 444 Douro Street
Stratford ON  N5A 0E6
Phone Number: (519) 273-0100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Stratford General Hospital Stratford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CATHERINE ANNE BARRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARRY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014