Barsalou, Julie (CPSO#: 92347)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Montreal, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 18 Oct 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 04 Jan 2010 to 12 Feb 2010
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 24 Oct 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Feb 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014