Barsoum, Randa Milad Kamal (CPSO#: 81686)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Feb 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Cairo, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
basement
10 Royal Orchard Blvd
Thornhill ON  L4T 3C3
Phone: (905) 771-7600
Fax: (905) 771-9600
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RANDA MILAD KAMAL BARSOUM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARSOUM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Jul 2005
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Feb 2005